Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. American Metal Group, Inc., et al.,
Plaintiff: |
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. |
Defendant: |
Howard Misle, American Metal Group, Inc., Cornerstone Nevada, LLC, Schnitzer Steel Industries, Inc.,, Nico Alloys, Inc.,, Larry Levine and Denyse MacMillan |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv03614 |
Filed: |
June 27, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Francisco Office |
County: |
San Francisco |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward M. Chen |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 17, 2017 |
Filing
84
ORDER DENYING 63 Motion to Stay, Resolving 65 Objection to 58 ; ADOPTING 58 Report and Recommendations re 52 Joint Discovery Letter Brief and CONTINUING Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 17, 2017. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
|
December 5, 2016 |
Filing
48
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/5/16. Show Cause Response due by 12/12/2016.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. American Metal Group, Inc., et al., |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Howard Misle |
Represented By: |
Gregory Aker |
Represented By: |
Donnelly Alison Gillen |
Represented By: |
Elizabeth Marie Pappy |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: American Metal Group, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Gregory Aker |
Represented By: |
Donnelly Alison Gillen |
Represented By: |
Elizabeth Marie Pappy |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Cornerstone Nevada, LLC |
Represented By: |
Gregory Aker |
Represented By: |
Donnelly Alison Gillen |
Represented By: |
Elizabeth Marie Pappy |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Schnitzer Steel Industries, Inc., |
Represented By: |
Bao M Vu |
Represented By: |
Thomas Andrew Woods |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Nico Alloys, Inc., |
Represented By: |
Gene Hitoshi Shioda |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Larry Levine |
Represented By: |
Gene Hitoshi Shioda |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Denyse MacMillan |
Represented By: |
Gene Hitoshi Shioda |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. |
Represented By: |
Andrew S. Elliott |
Represented By: |
Mark Douglas Lonergan |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?