California Union Square L.P. v. Saks & Company LLC.

Petitioner: California Union Square L.P.
Respondent: Saks & Company LLC.
Case Number: 4:2016cv04043
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION AND STRIKING [33-5] DOCUMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/23/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
May 18, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Relate Case. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/18/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
March 10, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Motion to Appear by Telephone at March 14, 2017 Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 9, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 28 Motion to Appear by Telephone at March 14, 2017 Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
October 18, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 21 Motion to Appear by Telephone at October 18, 2016 Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Union Square L.P. v. Saks & Company LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: California Union Square L.P.
Represented By: David Peter Fuad
Represented By: William Alan Molinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Saks & Company LLC.
Represented By: Marissa Marie Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?