ICE Consulting, Inc. et al v. Jensen

Plaintiff: ICE Consulting, Inc., Uzair Sattar and Derick Needham
Defendant: Gavin Jensen
Case Number: 4:2016cv04349
Filed: August 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2017 109 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 108 OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE AND COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT filed by ICE Consulting, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/9/19. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
January 30, 2017 105 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 103 to Vacate Without Prejudice the Hearing on ICE's Motion to Dismiss and Case Management Conference. Motions terminated: 78 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant and Counter-Claimant Gavin Jensen's Second, Third, Fourth, and Fifth Counterclaims. Case Management Statement due by 2/23/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/30/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 6, 2017 102 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Motion Hearing as to 78 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant and Counter-Claimant Gavin Jensen's Second, Third, Fourth, and Fifth Counterclaims is set for 2/2/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco befo re Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/6/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
December 12, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION filed by ICE Consulting, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/12/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
November 10, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER as to 78 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant and Counter-Claimant Gavin Jensen's Second, Third, Fourth, and Fifth Counterclaims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Case Management Statement du e by 12/8/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 12/15/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing reset for 12/15/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/10/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 4, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 85 for Early Settlement Conference filed by Gavin Jensen, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/4/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
October 11, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 Stipulation by All Parties Extending Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendant's Counterclaims and [Proposed] Order filed by ICE Consulting, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/11/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
September 16, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed. Show Cause Response due by 9/23/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/16/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
August 17, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 19 Order on Motion for TRO to Continue Hearing Date filed by Gavin Jensen. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 9/15/2016 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/17/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ICE Consulting, Inc. et al v. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ICE Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Sayed Ashar Ahmed
Represented By: Andrew Christian Crane
Represented By: Veronica Meryl Gray
Represented By: Jill Nicole Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uzair Sattar
Represented By: Sayed Ashar Ahmed
Represented By: Andrew Christian Crane
Represented By: Veronica Meryl Gray
Represented By: Jill Nicole Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derick Needham
Represented By: Sayed Ashar Ahmed
Represented By: Andrew Christian Crane
Represented By: Veronica Meryl Gray
Represented By: Jill Nicole Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Jensen
Represented By: Nitoj P. Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?