Ortiz v. Genco I, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Adan Ortiz
Defendant: Genco I, Inc. and Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv04601
Filed: August 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND SCHEDULING ISSUES; VACATING DEADLINE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION FILING re 37 Statement, filed by Adan Ortiz, Genco I, Inc., 39 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Adan Ortiz. Discovery Hearing set for Tuesday, 5/30/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/25/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
January 24, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re: Case No. 16-cv-07096-TEH. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/24/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
November 23, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/23/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Genco I, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adan Ortiz
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genco I, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole A. Legrottaglie
Represented By: Jeremy T. Naftel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Represented By: Catherine Suzanne Nasser
Represented By: Tayanah Caryn Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?