Nicholas Alford v. J.P. Morgan Chase, N.A.

Plaintiff: Nicholas Alford
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2016cv04723
Filed: August 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Close of Fact Discovery due by 7/7/2017; Designation of Experts due by 7/22/2017; Rebuttal Reports due by 8/7/2017; Close of Expert Discovery due by 8/21/2017; Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2018 03:00 PM; Jury Selection /Jury Trial set for 1/22/2018 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/14/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
January 31, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 34 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 6, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Respond to Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
December 22, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 12 MOTION TO DISMISS. Amended Pleadings due by 1/12/2017; Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2017; Further Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2017 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholas Alford v. J.P. Morgan Chase, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Alford
Represented By: Tiffany Rochelle Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?