Dennis M. Lorenz v. Safeway, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dennis M. Lorenz
Defendant: Safeway, Inc., Safeway Benefit Plans Committee and Great-West Financial RPS LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv04903
Filed: August 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Safeway Benefit Plans Committee, Safeway, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 17, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR THE SAFEWAY DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Safeway Benefit Plans Committee, Safeway, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 17, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
March 13, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
November 15, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Proposed Second Amended Complaint and Case Management Conference filed by Dennis M. Lorenz. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 15, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis M. Lorenz v. Safeway, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Benefit Plans Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great-West Financial RPS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis M. Lorenz
Represented By: Kyle Geoffrey Bates
Represented By: Jason H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?