September 22, 2017 |
Filing
76
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Motion terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/22/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
|
August 23, 2017 |
Filing
72
ORDER MOVING THE ALLOWABLE TIME FOR PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND DEFENDANT'S REPLY BY 3 DAYS; EXTENDING MEDIATION COMPLETION DEADLINE. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, pl aintiff's deadline to file a response to defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings is continued to August 28, 2017, and defendant's deadline to file a reply is continued to September 4, 2017. The mediation completion deadline is extended to October 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
|
August 16, 2017 |
Filing
70
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from August 25, 2017, to December 1, 2017. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than November 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/16/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
|
June 13, 2017 |
Filing
67
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.The case management conference is continued from June 16, 2017, to August 25, 2017. The parties shall file, no later than August 18, 2017, an updated Joint Case Management Statement, in which the parties set forth, inter alia, a proposed trial schedule, including proposed deadlines for discovery and dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
|
May 31, 2017 |
Filing
64
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. To the extent Wells Fargo seeks dismissal of Count I, the motion is granted. To the extent Wells Fargo seeks dismissal of Count II, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/31/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
|
May 16, 2017 |
Filing
63
ORDER GRANTING THIRD JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE. The mediation deadline is extended from June 13, 2017, to August 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/16/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
|
May 5, 2017 |
Filing
60
ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The May 12, 2017 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/05/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
|
April 17, 2017 |
Filing
58
ORDER GRANTING SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE. The mediation deadline is extended from May 13, 2017 to June 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/17/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017) Modified on 4/17/2017 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
|
April 11, 2017 |
Filing
56
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE. The mediation deadline is extended from April 13, 2017 to May 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/11/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
|
April 5, 2017 |
Filing
54
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to June 16, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than June 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/05/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
|
March 27, 2017 |
Filing
51
SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/27/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
|
February 24, 2017 |
Filing
46
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Should plaintiff wish to file a Second Amended Complaint, she shall file such pleading no later than March 13, 2017. The Case Management Conference is hereby continued to April 21, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than April 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
|
January 20, 2017 |
Filing
45
ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/20/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
|
January 13, 2017 |
Filing
44
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from January 27, 2017, to March 3, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than February 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
|
November 28, 2016 |
Filing
34
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/28/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
|
November 1, 2016 |
Filing
31
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LIMITED LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Counts I and III are dismissed without leave to amend and Counts II and IV are dismissed with leave to amend. Should Weaver wish to file a First Amended Complaint, Weaver shall file such pleading no later than November 18, 2016. The Case Management Conference is continued from December 2, 2016, to January 27, 2017, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 1, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
|
September 28, 2016 |
Filing
21
ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ORDER DEEMING DEFENDANTS' MOTION UNOPPOSED. The Court will afford plaintiff the opportunity to file his opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss by September 30, 2016. Defendants' reply is due no later than October 7, 2016. The Court sets aside its order vacating the November 4, 2016 hearing. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/28/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
|
September 26, 2016 |
Filing
19
ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. Plaintiff has not filed opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of the motion, the Court deems the matter suitable for decision thereon and vacates the hearing scheduled for November 4, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/26/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
|
September 14, 2016 |
Filing
17
IGNORE - ORDER FILED IN INCORRECT CASE. (Filed on 9/14/2016) Modified on 9/14/2016 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
|
September 7, 2016 |
Filing
13
ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/07/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
|