Ojmar US, LLC v. Security People, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ojmar US, LLC
Defendant: Security People, Inc. and Asil T. Gokcebay
Case Number: 4:2016cv04948
Filed: August 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2017 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 107 Stipulation to Move Conference Date. Telephone Conference set for 8/7/2017 11:00 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 2, 2017 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 21 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
July 11, 2017 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 101 Stipulation FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR OJMAR U.S., LLC TO SERVE THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. JUSTIN LENZO ON DEFENDANTS. Opening Reports due by 7/18/2017; Rebuttal Reports due by 9/8/2017; Depose by 9/18/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
July 10, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFF OJMAR U.S., LLCS 88 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
July 7, 2017 99 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re 93 request for sanctions. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/7/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 3, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 92 Stipulation to Allow Additional Discovery. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2017)
June 13, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re Joint Letter Brief ('277 and '644 Patents). Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/13/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017) Modified on 6/13/2017 (mejlc3, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re: Joint Letter Brief ('180 Patent). Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/12/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
June 7, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 75 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ojmar US, LLC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/7/2017. (mejlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
February 22, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re Dkt. No. 63 . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/22/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 21, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying Plaintiff's 62 Administrative Motion and Setting Schedule. Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/26/2017; Designation of Experts due by 7/11/2017; Rebuttal Reports due by 8/25/2017; Close of Expert Discovery due by 9/11/2017; Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2018 03:00 PM; Jury Selection /Jury Trial (7 Day) set for 1/16/2018 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
January 26, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING THE PARTIES ADMINISTRATIVE ( 19 , 43 , 47 ) MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
January 18, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 52 Administrative Motion for Administrative Relief to Schedule Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2017 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
December 16, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 41 Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 1, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 37 Stipulation re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Ojmar U.S., LLC's First Amended Complaint [Fed. R. Proc. 12(b)(6)]. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 10, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 27 Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule re 21 MOTION to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 3, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 22 Administrative Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Public Version of the First Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
October 19, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting GRANTING 14 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ojmar US, LLC v. Security People, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ojmar US, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Chilton Callaway
Represented By: James L. Day
Represented By: Roderick Manley Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security People, Inc.
Represented By: Forrest Arthur Hainline
Represented By: David J Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asil T. Gokcebay
Represented By: Forrest Arthur Hainline
Represented By: David J Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?