Ennova Research SRL v. Beebell Inc.

Plaintiff: Ennova Research SRL
Defendant: Beebell Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv05114
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 12 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 36 Motion to Set Aside Default. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
February 16, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 30 Order JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE SUBMISSION DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT BEEBELL'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed by Ennova Research SRL, Beebell Inc. Motions due by 3/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/16/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
November 29, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/2/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/29/2016. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ennova Research SRL v. Beebell Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ennova Research SRL
Represented By: Sassan Masserat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beebell Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?