Finn v. Sullivan et al

Plaintiff: Stephen A. Finn
Defendant: Kelleen F. Sullivan, Caireen M.T. Sullivan, Sean J. Sullivan, Ross A. Sullivan, Philomena Maureen Sulliva Gildea, Sullivan Vineyards Corporation and Sullivan Vineyards Partnership
Case Number: 4:2016cv05285
Filed: September 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff may re-file the motion for leave as a Rule 59(e) motion. Defendants shall jointly file a single response to this order by February 15, 2017. Plaintiff shall file his response by February 24, 2017. The motion is set for hearing on March 8, 2017, at 2 p.m. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/27/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 13, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTIONS HEARD JANUARY 4, 2017. Finn's claims are barred by judicial estoppel. Because leave to amend would be futile, his complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/13/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
December 13, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS - Reset Deadlines as to 28 First MOTION to Dismiss and 12 MOTION to Strike. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/13/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
October 20, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 STIPULATION extending deadlines re 12 MOTION to Strike. Response due by 11/1/2016. Reply due by 11/15/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/20/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finn v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen A. Finn
Represented By: Judy J Bao
Represented By: Andrew Dale Lanphere
Represented By: Philip S. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelleen F. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caireen M.T. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross A. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philomena Maureen Sulliva Gildea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan Vineyards Corporation
Represented By: Peter Logan Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan Vineyards Partnership
Represented By: Peter Logan Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?