Jaber v. BPI Sports LLC et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas Jaber
Defendant: BPI Sports LLC, Be Powerful LLC and Image Sports LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv05355
Filed: September 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/26/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
March 20, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION FOR STANDARD LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/20/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
February 13, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Counsel for both parties shall appear telephonically for the February 24, 2017 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
January 20, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; LIFTING DISCOVERY STAY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/20/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
December 16, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Discovery is stayed until the Court issues its ruling on defendants' pending motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/16/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 5, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON DEFENDANTS' FORTHCOMING MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY. Defendants shall file their motion to stay discovery and memorandum in support, not to exceed 10 pages, no later than December 8, 2016. Plaintiff shall file his o pposition to said motion, not to exceed 10 pages, no later than December 13, 2016. Defendants shall file their reply, not to exceed five pages, no later than noon on December 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/5/16.(mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
November 29, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE. ADR PROCESS. Per the parties' stipulation, they will participate in private mediation no later than 90 days after the Court issues an order on class certification. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/29/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaber v. BPI Sports LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Jaber
Represented By: Paul Kenneth Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPI Sports LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Be Powerful LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Image Sports LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?