Huettinger v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Plaintiff: Curt Huettinger
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and VMware, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv05397
Filed: September 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING [31 STIPULATION For Dismissal of Action with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/17/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
November 30, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 27 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
October 17, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Wozniak, Todd. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huettinger v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curt Huettinger
Represented By: Cassie Springer Ayeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMware, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Danielle Ahmad
Represented By: Todd David Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?