Sorihin et al v. Nguyen

Plaintiff: Sorihin and Abdul Fatah
Defendant: Thoai Van Nguyen
Case Number: 4:2016cv05422
Filed: September 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Thoai Van Nguyen. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 26, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 3, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (JOINT) TO CONTINUE CMC filed by Sorihin, Abdul Fatah. Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 3, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
April 10, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 53 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Thoai Van Nguyen. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 10, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
January 18, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Thoai Van Nguyen STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS filed by Thoai Van Nguyen. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 9, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER INSTRUCTING PARTIES TO FILE STIPULATION AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES AND HEARING DATE FOR COUNTER-DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Thoai Van Nguyen. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 9, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
December 22, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE filed by Sorihin, Abdul Fatah. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 22, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 5, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIM AND/OR A MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS ANSWER filed by Sorihin, Abdul Fatah. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 5, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorihin et al v. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sorihin
Represented By: Mana Barari
Represented By: Agnieszka Fryszman
Represented By: Alysson Ford Ouoba
Represented By: Yenny Teng-Lee
Represented By: Carole Vigne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul Fatah
Represented By: Mana Barari
Represented By: Agnieszka Fryszman
Represented By: Alysson Ford Ouoba
Represented By: Yenny Teng-Lee
Represented By: Carole Vigne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thoai Van Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?