Schurig v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Michael Schurig
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv05701
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defendants and against plaintiff Michael Schurig. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/13/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
March 28, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting 32 Motion to Dismiss]. Amended Pleadings due by NOON on 4/11/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
January 27, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Motions due by 2/9/2017. Responses due by 2/23/2017. Replies due by 3/2/2017. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/27/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
November 1, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CHASE BANK USA, N.A., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/1/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schurig v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schurig
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?