Oseguera v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Henry Oseguera
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv05706
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
June 27, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 56 Stipulation for dismissal of defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
January 4, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 26 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
January 3, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 33 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
December 29, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
December 21, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 24 Stipulation to Continue the Case Management Conference and Corresponding Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2017; Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2017 02:00 PM.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oseguera v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Oseguera
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Matthew Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?