King v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Katherine King
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Bank of America, National Association, Service Finance Company, LLC, TD Bank USA, National Association, EnerBank USA, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and LendingClub Corporation
Case Number: 4:2016cv05711
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2017 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AS TO DEFENDANTS CONSOLIDATED MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINTS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6): (1) DENYING MOTION AS TO KING; by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 106 Motion to Dismiss. Answer filed by 8/21/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 8/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
April 12, 2017 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINTS; BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS; VACATING STAY; DENYING STIPULATIONS AS MOOT; AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN CASE NO. 17-CV-0416. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/12/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
March 21, 2017 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting 31 Motion to Dismiss; granting 45 Motion to Dismiss; granting 55 Motion to Dismiss; granting 57 Motion to Dismiss; granting 58 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs response filed within seven days of this order. Case temporarily stayed until briefing completed. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
January 25, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax, Inc.'s 49 Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
December 15, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/15/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
November 23, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT re 16 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/23/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine King
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Anthony Q. Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Finance Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: Renee Choy Ohlendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EnerBank USA
Represented By: Pamela Lorraine Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LendingClub Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?