May et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Fidelia Del Carmen May Can, Rosana Guadalupe Gongora May, Luis Rodolfo Gongora May and Angel De Jesus May
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Nate Steger and Michael Mellone
Case Number: 4:2016cv05771
Filed: October 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/23/2018. Close of Fact Discovery due by 2/1/2018. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2018. Opening Reports due by 2/23/2018. Rebuttal Reports due by 3/9/2018. F urther Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Selection set for 8/20/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 7 Day Jury Trial set for 8/20/2018 08: 30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Dispositive/Daubert Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 8 /3/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing set for Friday, 7/13/2018 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/15/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
April 4, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson re: 31 32 requests for protective order and ORDER of referral re: discovery. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
March 13, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER: Discovery due by 7/9/2018. Motions due by 7/23/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2018 03:00 PM before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Jury Trial set for 10/22/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 3/13/18. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelia Del Carmen May Can
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosana Guadalupe Gongora May
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Rodolfo Gongora May
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel De Jesus May
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Steger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mellone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?