Sudhir v. PHH Mortgage

Plaintiff: Varinder Sudhir
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 4:2016cv06088
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge William Alsup [granting 43 Motion for Leave to File]. Second Amended Complaint due by 8/1/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
January 27, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (pursuant to 30 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 19, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO SECOND CLAIM by Judge William Alsup [denying 16 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
October 28, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Amended Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sudhir v. PHH Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varinder Sudhir
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Paul Aldo Grammatico
Represented By: Gregory Scott Korman
Represented By: Stuart Matthew Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?