Bowden v. Contract Callers, Inc.

Plaintiff: Keith Bowden
Defendant: Contract Callers, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv06171
Filed: October 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY. The instant action is stayed pending the D.C. Circuit's opinion in ACA International. No later than four weeks from the date the D.C. Circuit issues said opinion, the parties shall submit a joint report apprising the Court of the status of any appeal of ACA International, the status of the Ninth Circuit's review of Marks, and the parties' positions as to whether a continuation of the stay is warranted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/05/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
March 3, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY. The hearing scheduled for March 10, 2017, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/03/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
January 23, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 20, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. All counsel shall participate by telephone in the case management conference, which is scheduled for January 27, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/20/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
December 19, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/19/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
November 22, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING L.R. 6-2 STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR ANY MOTION FILED IN LIEU OF AN ANSWER. The opposition to any motion filed by defendant in lieu of an answer shall be filed no later than January 12, 2017, with any reply due no later than January 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/22/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 18, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/18/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowden v. Contract Callers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Bowden
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contract Callers, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?