Leyva v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Marianne Leyva
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Bank of America, National Association and Citibank, National Association
Case Number: 4:2016cv06366
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 56 for dismissal of defendant Equifax, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/3/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
April 13, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/1/2017 AT 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/25/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/13/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
February 3, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 19 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
January 10, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/10/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
November 28, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 12 for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/28/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leyva v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Leyva
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Raymond WIlliam Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?