Reckelhoff v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Reckelhoff
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 4:2016cv06379
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Equifax, Inc. filed by Kenneth Reckelhoff. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 31, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 1, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal of defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Kenneth Reckelhoff. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 1, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 13, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Kenneth Reckelhoff. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 13, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reckelhoff v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Reckelhoff
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Fugitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Megan Louise Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Represented By: Rebecca Snavely Saelao
Represented By: Courtney C Wenrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?