Dytch v. Guzman et al

Plaintiff: Albert Dytch
Defendant: Enrique Alejandro Guzman, Luz Maria Guzman and Alicia Guzman
Case Number: 4:2016cv06459
Filed: November 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. The action is dismissed without prejudice. The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Stipulated Judgment. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/28/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
February 16, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court having been advised that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this case, it is ordered that plaintiff's claims alleged against defendants herein be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that i f any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy thereof on the opposing party, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings as appropriate. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/16/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
January 18, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. The parties shall meet and confer no later than March 17, 2017. If the parties are unable to reach a settlement, plaintiff shall file a Notice of Need for Mediation within 14 days of the meet and confer. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/18/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dytch v. Guzman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Dytch
Represented By: Zachary Manning Best
Represented By: Tanya Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Alejandro Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luz Maria Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?