Moore v. Mars Petcare US, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Tamara Moore, Greta L. Ervin, Raff Arando, Nichols Smith, Renee Edgren and Cynthia Welton
Defendant: Mars Petcare US, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Company, Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., Medical Management International, Inc. and Bluepearl Vet, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv07001
Filed: December 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2017 115 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ADJUSTING FILING DATES. Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than August 10, 2017. Defendants' responsive pleadings, including motions to dismiss, shall be filed no later than September 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/27/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 10, 2017 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than July 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/10/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
April 4, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Hannah Y. Chanoine is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/04/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
January 10, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of James T. McKeown is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/10/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
January 9, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Jerry Frank Hogue is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/09/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
January 3, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Benjamin M. Greenblum is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/03/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Mars Petcare US, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Moore
Represented By: Edward J. Coyne, III
Represented By: Matthew D. Davis
Represented By: Lynwood P. Evans
Represented By: Kimberly Jean Johnson
Represented By: Michael Albert Kelly
Represented By: Julia Dayton Klein
Represented By: Michael L. McGlamry
Represented By: Spencer James Pahlke
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Wade H. Tomlinson
Represented By: Jeremy M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greta L. Ervin
Represented By: Edward J. Coyne, III
Represented By: Matthew D. Davis
Represented By: Lynwood P. Evans
Represented By: Kimberly Jean Johnson
Represented By: Michael Albert Kelly
Represented By: Julia Dayton Klein
Represented By: Michael L. McGlamry
Represented By: Spencer James Pahlke
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Wade H. Tomlinson
Represented By: Jeremy M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raff Arando
Represented By: Edward J. Coyne, III
Represented By: Matthew D. Davis
Represented By: Lynwood P. Evans
Represented By: Kimberly Jean Johnson
Represented By: Michael Albert Kelly
Represented By: Julia Dayton Klein
Represented By: Michael L. McGlamry
Represented By: Spencer James Pahlke
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Wade H. Tomlinson
Represented By: Jeremy M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichols Smith
Represented By: Edward J. Coyne, III
Represented By: Matthew D. Davis
Represented By: Lynwood P. Evans
Represented By: Kimberly Jean Johnson
Represented By: Michael Albert Kelly
Represented By: Julia Dayton Klein
Represented By: Michael L. McGlamry
Represented By: Spencer James Pahlke
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Wade H. Tomlinson
Represented By: Jeremy M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Edgren
Represented By: Edward J. Coyne, III
Represented By: Matthew D. Davis
Represented By: Lynwood P. Evans
Represented By: Kimberly Jean Johnson
Represented By: Michael Albert Kelly
Represented By: Julia Dayton Klein
Represented By: Michael L. McGlamry
Represented By: Spencer James Pahlke
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Wade H. Tomlinson
Represented By: Jeremy M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Welton
Represented By: Edward J. Coyne, III
Represented By: Matthew D. Davis
Represented By: Lynwood P. Evans
Represented By: Kimberly Jean Johnson
Represented By: Michael Albert Kelly
Represented By: Julia Dayton Klein
Represented By: Michael L. McGlamry
Represented By: Spencer James Pahlke
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Wade H. Tomlinson
Represented By: Jeremy M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mars Petcare US, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Faucette
Represented By: Benjamin M Greenblum
Represented By: John Edward Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle Purina Petcare Company
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Jerry Frank Hogue
Represented By: Bryan Alexander Merryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Frederick Tubach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petsmart, Inc.
Represented By: James T. McKeown
Represented By: Alan Ouellette
Represented By: Eileen Regina Ridley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Management International, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Faucette
Represented By: Benjamin M Greenblum
Represented By: John Edward Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluepearl Vet, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Faucette
Represented By: Benjamin M Greenblum
Represented By: John Edward Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?