Berkeley Research Group, LLC v. United Potato Growers of America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Berkeley Research Group, LLC
Defendant: United Potato Growers of America, Inc., United Potato Growers of Idaho, Inc., Idagro, Inc., Albert Wada, Wada Farms, Inc., Wada Farms Potatoes, Inc., Wada Farms Marketing Group, LLC, Wada-Van Orden Potatoes, Inc., Cedar Farms, Inc., Wada Family, LLC, Profresh, LLC, Jeff Raybould, Raybould Brothers Farms, LLC, Michael Cranney, Cornelison Farms, Inc., Keith Cornelison, Snake River Plains Potatoes, Inc., Lance Funk, Pleasant Valley Potato, Inc., KCW Farms, Inc. and Kim Wahlen
Case Number: 4:2016cv07205
Filed: December 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING ACTION, DENYING PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANTS' REQUESTS FOR FEES AND COSTS, AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge William Alsup [denying 43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 46 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 10 Motion to Remand; finding as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
March 13, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER HOLDING MOTION TO REMAND IN ABEYANCE PENDING JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY Show Cause Brief due by 3/30/2017. Responses due by 4/6/2017.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/13/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 3, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/3/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
February 23, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ALLOWING SURREPLY AND DENYING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/23/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkeley Research Group, LLC v. United Potato Growers of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkeley Research Group, LLC
Represented By: Mortimer H. Hartwell
Represented By: Kurt Benjamin Oldenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Potato Growers of America, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Potato Growers of Idaho, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idagro, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Wada
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wada Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wada Farms Potatoes, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wada Farms Marketing Group, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wada-Van Orden Potatoes, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wada Family, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Profresh, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Raybould
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raybould Brothers Farms, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cranney
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornelison Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Cornelison
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snake River Plains Potatoes, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Funk
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasant Valley Potato, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCW Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Wahlen
Represented By: Jennifer Schrack Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?