Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez v. Tigran Gumushyan et al

Plaintiff: Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez
Defendant: Tigran Gumushyan, Darryl Onizuka and Doe Vazquez
Respondent: United States of America
Movant: Defendant Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2016cv07236
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2017 134 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying 133 Motion for Reconsideration. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 16, 2017 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 121 Motion to Dismiss. The court dismisses the complaint for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
April 6, 2017 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Mr. Lopez's request to proceed IFP on appeal. ECF Nos. 117, 120. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/6/2017. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
March 9, 2017 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler regarding ECF Nos. 100, 101, 107. Mr. Lopez already consented to magistrate-judge jurisdiction and, absent good cause or extraordinary circumstances, he cannot withdraw it. His declination at ECF No. 100 is therefore ineffective. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
January 17, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security, 16-cv-2732-LB. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/17/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez v. Tigran Gumushyan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tigran Gumushyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Onizuka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Defendant Commissioner
Represented By: Cedina M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?