Gonzales v. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings

Plaintiff: Jeannie Gonzales
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
Case Number: 4:2016cv07346
Filed: December 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 27 Stipulation Re 24 Order Joint Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order: Close of Fact Discovery due by 10/13/2017; Designation of Experts due by 10/27/2017; Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 11/10/2017; Close of Expert Discovery due by 11/24/2017; Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2018 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
April 6, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/6/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
March 29, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/29/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 27, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 14 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Gonzales
Represented By: Eric M. Lightman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?