Saji v. Residential Credit Solutions, a business entity et al

Plaintiff: Daisy Saji
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Bank of New York Mellon and Ditech Financial LLC
Case Number: 4:2017cv00025
Filed: January 4, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Residential Credit Solutions Inc. re 45 Stipulation, filed by Ditech Financial LLC, Bank of New York Mellon, Residential Credit Solutions, Daisy Saji. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/28/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
July 26, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING AND PRETRIAL ORDER; VACATING the Case Management Conference set for 8/7/17. REFERRED TO ADR FOR ADR ASSESSMENT; Close of Expert Discovery due by 12/20/2017. Close of Fact Discovery due by 12/20/2017. Case Management Statement due by 1 1/6/2017. Dispositive Motion due by 1/16/2018. Opening Reports due by 11/5/2017. Rebuttal Reports due by 12/5/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Selection set for 4/16/20 18 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Trial set for 4/16/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2018 09:00 AM in Cour troom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance hearing re Defendant Residential Credit Solutions is set for 9/1/2017 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Trial set for 4/17/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4t h Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance hearing re pretrial preparation set for 3/9/2018 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Trial set for 4/18/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/26/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
April 20, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 17 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2017. Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
March 27, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER SUBMISSION; VACATING HEARING. The Court VACATES the hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss currently set for April 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/27/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saji v. Residential Credit Solutions, a business entity et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Saji
Represented By: Eunji Cho
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Meagan S. Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Meagan S. Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Meagan S. Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?