Aspic Engineering and Construction Company v. ECC Centcom Constructors LLC et al

Plaintiff: Aspic Engineering and Construction Company
Defendant: ECC Centcom Constructors LLC and ECC International LLC
Case Number: 4:2017cv00224
Filed: January 17, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 44 Motion for Reconsideration. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 18, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance hearing set for Friday, 12/15/2017 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint filing by 12/8/2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/18/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
May 25, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 34 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment; granting 22 Motion to Vacate Judgment. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
February 13, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 16 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to File Response and Setting Hearing. Updated Stipulation filed by 2/24/17. Compliance hearing set for Friday, 3/3/2017 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aspic Engineering and Construction Company v. ECC Centcom Constructors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspic Engineering and Construction Company
Represented By: Walt Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECC Centcom Constructors LLC
Represented By: Andrew S. Azarmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECC International LLC
Represented By: Andrew S. Azarmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?