Betty Grinder v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Betty Grinder
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Comenity, LLC, Discover Financial Services, TD Bank USA, National Association and RC Willey Home Furnishings, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2017cv00343
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [re 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/14/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
March 20, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
February 8, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (pursuant to 14 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
January 31, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Motions due by 2/9/2017. Responses due by 2/23/2017. Replies due by 3/2/2017. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/31/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betty Grinder v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Grinder
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Megan Louise Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Financial Services
Represented By: Alan Stanley Petlak
Represented By: Taylor Robert Steinbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RC Willey Home Furnishings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?