Rioux v. Equifax, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dominique Rioux
Defendant: Equifax, Inc. and Bank of America, National Association
Case Number: 4:2017cv00345
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 for dismissal of Defendant Equifax, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/25/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
July 20, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/28/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 9/21/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/20/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
June 5, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 21 for dismissal of Defendant Bank of America, N.A. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/5/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rioux v. Equifax, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Rioux
Represented By: Joe B. Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?