Muehlenberg v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kristen Muehlenberg
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Case Number: 4:2017cv00392
Filed: January 25, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 41 MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with prejudice. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/28/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
November 13, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Stipulation to continue hearing as to 41 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing reset for 12/6/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/13/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 8, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING ON CONSIDERATION OF EVIDENCE BEYOND THE COMPLAINT re 41 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to address, in no more than five pages, whether she objects to the incorporation of her credit reports by reference by November 13, 2017 and how her interpretation of them differs from Chase's. Any response by the Chase Defendants of no more than five pages must be filed by November 15, 2017. The hearing shall be continued to November 22, 2017 at 10 a.m. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/08/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
October 31, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/31/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
August 28, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING CHASE DEFENDANTS' 30 MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within twenty one (21) days. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muehlenberg v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Muehlenberg
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?