Rose v. Equifax, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lacy Rose
Defendant: Equifax, Inc., TransUnion, Inc., First Data Merchant Services, LLC and TD Bank USA, National Association
Case Number: 4:2017cv00419
Filed: January 26, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT EQUIFAX, INC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/22/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 7, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for June 16, 2017, is continued to October 20, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than October 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
May 8, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TRANS UNION, LLC ONLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/08/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
April 13, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TD BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 10, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT FIRST DATA MERCHANT SERVICES, LLC TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/10/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
April 7, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT TD BANK USA, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. Defendant T.D. Bank USA, N.A.'s motion to dismiss is denied as moot and the hearing thereon, scheduled for April 28, 2017, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
April 5, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT TRANSUNION, LLC. Plaintiff's claims against Trans Union, LLC are dismissed without prejudice, provided, however, that if any of said parties certifies to this Court, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy thereof on opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/05/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
March 29, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued to June 16, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than June 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/29/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
February 27, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Ethan G. Ostroff is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/27/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
February 24, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Ellen Silverman is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 23, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 9, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Christopher A. Ferguson is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/09/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Equifax, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacy Rose
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Ferguson
Represented By: David James Streza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Data Merchant Services, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Rose Ellis Lohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: Renee Choy Ohlendorf
Represented By: Ellen B. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?