David Strong v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David Strong
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and TD Bank USA, National Association
Case Number: 4:2017cv00503
Filed: January 31, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 38 to Extend Time for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/26/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
May 26, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 35 for Extension of Time for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/26/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
April 28, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. TO RESPOND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/28/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 7, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for dismissal of Defendant TD Bank USA, National Association. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/7/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
March 17, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 19 TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/17/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
March 3, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 17 for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/3/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Strong v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Strong
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Chung Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: Renee Choy Ohlendorf
Represented By: Ellen B. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?