Otero v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Earlene Otero
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 4:2017cv00508
Filed: January 31, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Respond to First Amended Complaint and [Proposed] Order filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/27/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
May 26, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Respond to First Amended Complaint and [Proposed] Order filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/26/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 1, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1 Complaint, TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. TO RESPOND filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/1/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 7, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 Stipulation to extend time to respond filed by Earlene Otero. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/7/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
March 20, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/20/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 6, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/6/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otero v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earlene Otero
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Chung Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?