Lindsey v. United Airlines Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Eddie Lindsey
Defendant: United Airlines Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc. and United Continental Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2017cv00753
Filed: February 15, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY EDWARD GOOLSBY by Judge William Alsup granting 60 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2017)
October 23, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF EDDIE LINDSEY'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY AND TO TERMINATE ELECTRONIC NOTICES by Judge William Alsup granting 58 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney..(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
June 2, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
May 15, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS re 38 Proposed Order filed by United Airlines Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., United Continental Holdings, Inc. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/15/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
March 27, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Hon. William Alsup granting 25 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey v. United Airlines Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Lindsey
Represented By: Mark Christopher Holden
Represented By: Steven John Mitby
Represented By: Jason M. Skaggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines Inc.
Represented By: Scott Matthew Klausner
Represented By: Donna DAngelo Melby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Matthew Klausner
Represented By: Donna DAngelo Melby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Continental Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Matthew Klausner
Represented By: Donna DAngelo Melby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?