Karkanen v. Family Court Services of Contra Costa County et al

Plaintiff: Kristina Marie Karkanen
Defendant: Family Court Services of Contra Costa County, James Paulsen, Magda Lopez, Tish Reese and Elizabeth Braunstein
Case Number: 4:2017cv00999
Filed: February 27, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of County of Contra Costa, Family Court Services of Contra Costa County, Elizabeth Braunstein, James Paulsen, Magda Lopez, Tish Reese against Kristina Marie Karkanen. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2017)
June 26, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS ( 7 , 18 ) MOTIONS TO DISMISS, DENYING PLAINTIFFS 15 MOTION TO SEAL, AND DENYING DEFENDANTS 30 MOTION TO STAY.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
April 11, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 11 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karkanen v. Family Court Services of Contra Costa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Marie Karkanen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Court Services of Contra Costa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Paulsen
Represented By: Kimberly M. Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magda Lopez
Represented By: Kimberly M. Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tish Reese
Represented By: Kimberly M. Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Braunstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?