Ziolkowski v. Netflix, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Ziolkowski
Defendant: Netflix, Inc., Reed Hastings and David Wells
Case Number: 4:2017cv01070
Filed: March 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 60 Stipulation Requesting Entry of Order Dismissing Amended Complaint With Prejudice re 59 Order on Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 34 MOTION TO DISMISS. Amended Pleadings due by 10/23/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 56 Administrative Motion For Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority and Statement of Recent Decision and 57 Stipulation Re Administrative Motion For Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority and Statement of Recent Decision. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 51 Stipulation to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alexander L. Burns. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING BAGLEYS 20 MOTION AND GRANTING DUDASHS 24 MOTION RE: APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order Regarding Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint and to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziolkowski v. Netflix, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ziolkowski
Represented By: Ramzi Abadou
Represented By: David J. Harris, Jr.
Represented By: Trenton Ross Kashima
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Krinsk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?