Amundsen v. Comcast Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Douglas Amundsen
Defendant: Comcast Corporation and Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC
Case Number: 4:2017cv01302
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 21 Stipulation rescheduling Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 5, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Stipulation Amending Complaint and Substituting as Defendant Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC in Place of Erroneously Named "Comcast (CC) of Willow Grove". (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
June 27, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 11 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 26, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 14 Stipulation. Amended Pleadings due by 7/28/2017; Close of Fact Discovery due by 12/22/2017; Designation of Experts due by 3/2/2018; Rebuttal Reports due by 3/23/2018; Close of Exper t Discovery due by 4/20/2018; Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2018 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2018 03:00 PM; Jury Selection / Jury Trial set for 5/21/2018 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amundsen v. Comcast Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Amundsen
Represented By: David C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Brian H. Chun
Represented By: Susan Tayeko Kumagai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC
Represented By: Brian H. Chun
Represented By: Susan Tayeko Kumagai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?