Food & Water Watch, Inc. et al v. Environmental Protection Agency et al

Plaintiff: Food & Water Watch, Inc., American Academy of Environmental Medicine, Fluoride Action Network, International Academy of Oral Medicine & Toxicology, Moms Against Fluoridation, Audrey Adams, Kyle Adams, Kristin Lavelle, Neal Lavelle, Brenda Staudenmaier, Ko Staudenmaier and Hayden Staudenmaier
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Scott Pruitt
Case Number: 4:2017cv02162
Filed: April 18, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 30:181
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2018 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: discovery schedule. Discovery due by 11/21/2018.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/15/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
February 7, 2018 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 41 Defendant's Motion to Limit Review to the Administrative Record. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
December 21, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 28 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 5, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 briefing schedule on Motion for Protective Order and resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/25/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion for Protective Order Hearing set for 1/25/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/5/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Response to the Complaint and to Establish Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss filed by E. Scott Pruitt, United States Environmental Protection Agency. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/5/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Food & Water Watch, Inc. et al v. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Food & Water Watch, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Academy of Environmental Medicine
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fluoride Action Network
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Academy of Oral Medicine & Toxicology
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moms Against Fluoridation
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Adams
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Adams
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Lavelle
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Lavelle
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Staudenmaier
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ko Staudenmaier
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayden Staudenmaier
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?