Walls v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Brenda Walls
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2017cv02199
Filed: April 19, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 Stipulation Joint regarding Dismissal with Prejudice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
May 2, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/2/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
April 25, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., Granting 5 Plaintiff's Application for a Temporary Restraining Order, Ordering Defendant to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, Denying Plaintiff's Request for Fees and Costs, and Directing Plaintiff to Effect Service of Process. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walls v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Walls
Represented By: Chi N Dinh
Represented By: Arasto Farsad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?