United States, ex rel. et al v. T L Peterson, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States, ex rel. and Matthew Zugsberger
Defendant: T L Peterson, Inc., Galindo Construction Company, Inc., Lisa M Galindo and Don Ron Galindo
Case Number: 4:2017cv02277
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Tehama
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying Plaintiff's 126 Motion for Sanctions. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Defendant's 159 Motion to Adjust Maintenance Rate. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Granting 65 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Denying 93 Motion for Leave to File; Denying 103 Motion for Leave to File. (kawlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE ADR DEADLINE filed by Galindo Construction Company, Inc., Lisa M Galindo, T L Peterson, Inc., Matthew Zugsberger, Don Ron Galindo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/28/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER requiring supplemental briefing re 65 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment FOR INSTATEMENT OF MAINTENANCE AND CURE, PAYMENT OF PAST MAINTENANCE AND CURE, AND TO SET MAINTENANCE RATES filed by Matthew Zugsberger, ORDER Continuing Hearing on 65 Motion to 9/20/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Plaintiff's supplemental brief due by 8/17/2018. Defendants' response due by 8/31/2018. Further Case Management Conference continued to 10/9/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2018. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/31/2018. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 65 . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment FOR INSTATEMENT OF MAINTENANCE AND CURE, PAYMENT OF PAST MAINTENANCE AND CURE, AND TO SET MAINTENANCE RATES filed by Matthew Zugsberger, Set/Reset Deadlines as to [65 ] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment FOR INSTATEMENT OF MAINTENANCE AND CURE, PAYMENT OF PAST MAINTENANCE AND CURE, AND TO SET MAINTENANCE RATES. Responses due by 6/28/2018. Replies due by 7/10/2018. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/10/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 58 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER filed by Galindo Construction Company, Inc., Lisa M Galindo, T L Peterson, Inc., Matthew Zugsberger, Don Ron Galindo. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2018 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/27/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 . STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Matthew Zugsberger filed by Galindo Construction Company, Inc., Lisa M Galindo, T L Peterson, Inc., Matthew Zugsberger, Don Ron Galindo. Case referred to mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/25/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 39 Stipulation to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Matthew Zugsberger, United States, ex rel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/5/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Galindo Construction Company, Inc., Lisa M Galindo, T L Peterson, Inc., Matthew Zugsberger, Don Ron Galindo. Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2018 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/14/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States, ex rel. et al v. T L Peterson, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States, ex rel.
Represented By: Peter Stanley Prows
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Zugsberger
Represented By: Gordon T Carey, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce J Highman
Represented By: Bruce J. Highman
Represented By: Louis A Highman
Represented By: Nicholas John Neidzwski
Represented By: Peter Stanley Prows
Represented By: Max Rollens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T L Peterson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galindo Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Abernethy
Represented By: Lukas Jon Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa M Galindo
Represented By: Ryan Abernethy
Represented By: Lukas Jon Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Ron Galindo
Represented By: Ryan Abernethy
Represented By: Lukas Jon Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?