Kelly v. Worth Holdings, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Kelly
Defendant: Worth Holdings, LLC and E.S. West Coast, LLC
Case Number: 4:2017cv02466
Filed: May 1, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2018 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Thomas Kelly. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/31/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
March 23, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER <I Stipulated Protective Order filed by Worth Holdings, LLC, E.S. West Coast, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/23/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
November 27, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES filed by Thomas Kelly. Case Management Statement due by 12/14/2017. Further Case Management Conference reset for 12/21/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/27/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
September 18, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 13 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Worth Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worth Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Katherine S. Catlos
Represented By: Brandon Tyler Khalil Kahoush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.S. West Coast, LLC
Represented By: Katherine S. Catlos
Represented By: Brandon Tyler Khalil Kahoush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kelly
Represented By: Nicole M. Jaffee
Represented By: Michael Gregory Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?