Resolute Forest Products, Inc. et al v. Greenpeace International et al

Plaintiff: Resolute Forest Products, Inc., Resolute FP US, Inc., Resolute FP Augusta, LLC, Fibrek General Partnership, Fibrek U.S., Inc., Fibrek International, Inc. and Resolute FP Canada, Inc.
Defendant: Greenpeace International, Greenpeace, Inc., Greenpeace Fund, Inc., ForestEthics, Daniel Brindis, Amy Moas, Matthew Daggett, Rolf Skar, Todd Paglia and John and Jane Does 1-20
Movant: The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 11 additional media organizations
Amicus: Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Center for international Environmental Law, Defenders of Wildlife, FishWise, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club, Sustainable Fisheries Partnership Foundation and The Wilderness Society
Case Number: 4:2017cv02824
Filed: May 17, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2017 182 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 181 Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Extend Deadline To File First Amended Complaint filed by Resolute FP Canada, Inc., Resolute FP US, Inc., Fibrek U.S., Inc., Fibrek General Partnership, Fibrek International, Inc., Resolute FP Augusta, LLC, Resolute Forest Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
October 31, 2017 178 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 177 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO MOVE FOR FEES filed by Greenpeace International, Matthew Daggett, Amy Moas, Greenpeace, Inc., Rolf Skar, Daniel Brindis. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 31, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 16, 2017 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO STRIKE, GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 55 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part 56 Motion to Strike ; granting in part 60 Motion to Strike ; granting 61 Motion to Dismiss ; granting 62 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 11/6/2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
August 18, 2017 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 150 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Supplement Briefing filed by Todd Paglia, ForestEthics. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
August 9, 2017 149 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 144 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO SUPPLEMENT BRIEFING ON GREENPEACE FUND, INC.'S PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND STRIKE filed by Greenpeace Fund, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 9, 2017. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
July 12, 2017 131 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 129 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 60 MOTION to Strike Pursuant to O.C.G.A. Section 9-11-11.1 and Memorandum in Support, 61 MOTION to Dismiss / Stipulation to Supplement Briefing o n Motions to Dismiss and Strike filed by Resolute FP Canada, Inc., Resolute FP US, Inc., Fibrek U.S., Inc., Fibrek General Partnership, Fibrek International, Inc., Resolute FP Augusta, LLC, Resolute Forest Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 12, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
May 16, 2017 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion to Change Venue; granting 62 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is Ordered to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. The Clerk is further Ordered to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/16/2017. (thb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Resolute Forest Products, Inc. et al v. Greenpeace International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resolute Forest Products, Inc.
Represented By: Lyn Robyn Agre
Represented By: Michael J Bowe
Represented By: James B. Ellington
Represented By: Lauren Tabaksblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resolute FP US, Inc.
Represented By: Lyn Robyn Agre
Represented By: Michael J Bowe
Represented By: James B. Ellington
Represented By: Lauren Tabaksblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resolute FP Augusta, LLC
Represented By: Lyn Robyn Agre
Represented By: Michael J Bowe
Represented By: James B. Ellington
Represented By: Lauren Tabaksblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fibrek General Partnership
Represented By: Lyn Robyn Agre
Represented By: Michael J Bowe
Represented By: James B. Ellington
Represented By: Lauren Tabaksblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fibrek U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Lyn Robyn Agre
Represented By: Michael J Bowe
Represented By: James B. Ellington
Represented By: Lauren Tabaksblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fibrek International, Inc.
Represented By: Lyn Robyn Agre
Represented By: Michael J Bowe
Represented By: James B. Ellington
Represented By: Lauren Tabaksblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resolute FP Canada, Inc.
Represented By: Lyn Robyn Agre
Represented By: Michael J Bowe
Represented By: James B. Ellington
Represented By: Lauren Tabaksblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenpeace International
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura R. Handman
Represented By: Lance L. Koonce
Represented By: Thomas W. Tucker
Represented By: Lisa Beth Zycherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenpeace, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura R. Handman
Represented By: Lance L. Koonce
Represented By: Thomas W. Tucker
Represented By: Lisa Beth Zycherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenpeace Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Laura R. Handman
Represented By: Lance L. Koonce
Represented By: James S. Murray
Represented By: Lisa Beth Zycherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ForestEthics
Represented By: Thomas M. Barton
Represented By: Aaron P.M. Tady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Brindis
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura R. Handman
Represented By: Lance L. Koonce
Represented By: Thomas W. Tucker
Represented By: Lisa Beth Zycherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Moas
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura R. Handman
Represented By: Lance L. Koonce
Represented By: Thomas W. Tucker
Represented By: Lisa Beth Zycherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Daggett
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura R. Handman
Represented By: Lance L. Koonce
Represented By: Thomas W. Tucker
Represented By: Lisa Beth Zycherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolf Skar
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Laura R. Handman
Represented By: Lance L. Koonce
Represented By: Thomas W. Tucker
Represented By: Lisa Beth Zycherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Paglia
Represented By: Thomas M. Barton
Represented By: Aaron P.M. Tady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 11 additional media organizations
Represented By: Gerald Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Alaska Wilderness League
Represented By: Robert B. Jackson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Robert B. Jackson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Center for international Environmental Law
Represented By: Robert B. Jackson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Robert B. Jackson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: FishWise
Represented By: Robert B. Jackson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Physicians for Social Responsibility
Represented By: Robert B. Jackson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Sierra Club
Represented By: Robert B. Jackson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Sustainable Fisheries Partnership Foundation
Represented By: Robert B. Jackson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: The Wilderness Society
Represented By: Robert B. Jackson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?