Eolas Technologies Incorporated v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Eolas Technologies Incorporated
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 4:2017cv03023
Filed: May 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #122 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Walmart Stores, Inc.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 122 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Allen Wang filed by Walmart Inc.. Responses due by 9/5/2019. Replies due by 9/12/2019. (Wang, Allen) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 121 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019:Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Order Granting Notice of Withdrawal of Eric S. Schlichter as Counsel for Walmart Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 21, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE by Walmart Inc. of Withdrawal of Eric S. Schlichter as Counsel for Walmart Inc. and [Proposed] Order (Keville, John) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 118 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/20/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 117 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/20/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Walmart Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/20/2019. Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorney: John Campbell, Robert Litts. Defendant Attorney: Bijal Vakil, John Keville. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/20/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 115 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Campbell, John) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Order to Reflect Name Change From Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. To Walmart Inc. by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #113 Joint Stipulation. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 113 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Reflect Name Change from Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. to Walmart Inc. filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING WALMART'S UNOPPOSED REQUEST #111 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Jon S. Tigar. Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 111 Walmart's Unopposed Request for Case Management Conference filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
August 16, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores Inc to Court regarding Joint Status Update (Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re #108 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 24, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 23, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Kevin Lee Burgess (Withdrawal of Craig Tolliver as Counsel for Eolas Technologies - Corrected) (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 23, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Kevin Lee Burgess (Withdrawal of Craig Tolliver as Counsel for Eolas Technologies) (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE of Change of Address by Allen W. Wang (Wang, Allen) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Edmund Lancaster (Lancaster, Eric) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE of Change of Address by Shamita Etienne-Cummings (Etienne-Cummings, Shamita) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE of Change of Address by Bijal Vijay Vakil (Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Court Deadlines Other than those Set Forth in the Court's September 27, 2017 Order filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 2, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Court Deadlines Other than those Set Forth in the Court's September 27, 2017 Order filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Amit Makker)(Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Court Deadlines filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 26, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 Filing 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Court Deadlines filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Carl Anderson)(Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #97 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Modify Court Deadlines filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 97 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Modify Court Deadlines filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Richard Frenkel in support of Joint Stipulation, #(2) [Proposed] Order)(Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #94 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING PAGE LIMITS FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION/CROSS-MOTION filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 95 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Exceed Page Limits for Motion for Summary Judgment, Opposition and Cross-Motion re #94 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING PAGE LIMITS FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION/CROSS-MOTION filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Responses due by 9/15/2017. (Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 94 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING PAGE LIMITS FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION/CROSS-MOTION filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
August 15, 2017 Filing 93 Second Amended ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint with Jury Trial Demanded; -Second Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed in Case No. 3:17-cv-03022, Dkt 038 filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #90 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Setting Early Summary Judgment and Claim Construction Reconsideration Briefing Schedules (Corrected) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/31/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Hearing on summary judgment motions set for 12/5/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER REGARDING AUGUST 2, 2017 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #88 [Proposed] Order filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 90 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Setting Early Summary Judgment and Claim Construction Reconsideration Briefing Schedules re #87 Case Management Conference - (Corrected) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 89 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Setting Early Summary Judgment and Claim Construction Reconsideration Briefing Schedules re #87 Case Management Conference filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 88 [Proposed] Order Regarding August 2, 2017 Case Management Conference re #87 Case Management Conference filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 2, 2017 Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/2/2017. Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 44 minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/2/2017)
July 24, 2017 Filing 86 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #84 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Rescheduling July 5, 2017 Case Management Conference for August 2, 2017 filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 21, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 84 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Rescheduling July 5, 2017 Case Management Conference for August 2, 2017 filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of James Quigley)(Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #81 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting Private ADR by Eolas Technologies Incorporated and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 14, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 82 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 81 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting Private ADR by Eolas Technologies Incorporated and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Quigley, James) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 80 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Quigley, James) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 12, 2017 Filing 79 NOTICE of Change In Counsel filed by Bijal Vijay Vakil of Notice Of Withdrawal of Counsel [Thomas Conor Flynn] [Civil L.R. 11-5] (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order) (Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
June 12, 2017 Filing 78 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Vakil, Bijal) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHN R. KEVILLE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ROBERT L. GREEN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #74 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ERIC S. SCHLICHTER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #73 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Robert L. Green, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11454521) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Green, Robert) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to Aappear in Pro Hac Vice Eric S. Schlichter, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11454463) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Schlichter, Eric) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice John R. Keville, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11454390) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Keville, John) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CRAIG N. TOLLIVER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES E. QUIGLEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHN B. CAMPBELL PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #64 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KEVIN L. BURGESS PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 5, 2017 Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/5/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for James L. Quigley, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11443132) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Quigley, James) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Craig N. Tolliver, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11443116) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Tolliver, Craig) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for John B. Campbell, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11443105) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Campbell, John) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kevin L. Burgess, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11443094) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 6/2/17. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 1, 2017 Filing 61 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Adams Ryan, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
June 1, 2017 Filing 60 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Adams Ryan, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
June 1, 2017 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie M. Adams Ryan (Adams Ryan, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 31, 2017 Filing 58 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2017 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #(1) Standing Order for Mag. Judge Sallie Kim, #(2) Standing Order for All Judges) (tnS) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 57 CASE TRANSFERRED in from United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas (Tyler); Case Number 6:15-cv-01040-RWS. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received. Modified on 5/31/2017 (tnS).
May 23, 2017 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (mll, )
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER TO SEVER AND TRANSFER. All claims asserted by Plaintiff Eolas Technologies Inc. against Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC are hereby SEVERED from the above-captioned action into a new cause of action. The filing fee for the severed cause of action against Wal-Mart Stores Texas is waived.The above-captioned action against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Given the approaching deadlines under this Court's current docket control order, all deadlines in the above-numbered action against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. are STAYED until the case is received and reassigned by the clerk of the Northern District of California and until further order of that Court. The Court further ORDERS that the severed action against Wal-Mart Stores Texas is hereby STAYED pending resolution of the transferred claims. The parties shall file a joint status report within seven days of the entry of final judgment (or other resolution of the transferred claims) in the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/28/17. (mll, )
April 28, 2017 ***All claims against Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC are SEVERED into civil action 6:17cv242.*** (mll, )
April 28, 2017 ***This civil action will the transferred to the Northern District of California on or after 5-19-2017, per Local Rule CV-83(b).*** (mll, )
April 28, 2017 Case Stayed pending transfer to the Northern District of California. (mll, ) Modified on 4/28/2017 (mll, ).
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time. Eolas's and Walmart's responsive severance briefing #49 is due 4-17-2017. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/20/17. (mll, )
April 17, 2017 Filing 54 RESPONSE to #52 Sealed Patent Document Walmart's Response to Eolas's Supplemental Brief Regarding Possible Severance of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Keville, John)
April 17, 2017 Filing 53 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated to #51 Notice (Other), filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - March 2, 2017 E-mail)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 13, 2017 Filing 52 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.EOLAS TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING POSSIBLE SEVERANCE OF WAL-MART STORES TEXAS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 13, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re #39 Emergency SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration of Order Denying Walmart's Motion to Transfer Venue [Dkt No. 35] Walmart's SUPPLEMENTAL Brief Regarding Its Emergency Motion for Reconsideration (Attachments: #1 Appendix UltimatePointer, LLC v. Nintendo, Ltd., 611cv496 DE 448)(Keville, John)
April 10, 2017 Filing 50 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re #39 Emergency SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration of Order Denying Walmart's Motion to Transfer Venue [Dkt No. 35] filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Parties shall submit supplemental briefing regarding whether the Court should sever Plaintiff Eolas Technologies, Inc.'s claims against Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Texas from Case No. 6:15-cv-1040 into a new action. The Wal-Mart parties and Eolas shall file their supplemental briefs by 4-13-2017. Each brief shall not exceed ten pages. Any responses shall be filed by 4-15-2017 and shall not exceed five pages. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/06/17. (mll, )
April 4, 2017 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2017 re #39 Emergency SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration of Order Denying Walmart's Motion to Transfer Venue [Dkt No. 35] filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Court Reporter Theresa Sawyer) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
March 27, 2017 Filing 47 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #39 Emergency SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration of Order Denying Walmart's Motion to Transfer Venue [Dkt No. 35] filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin)
March 20, 2017 Filing 46 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 Emergency SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration of Order Denying Walmart's Motion to Transfer Venue [Dkt No. 35] filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bijal V. Vakil, #2 Exhibit 1 to Vakil Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Vakil Declaration)(Vakil, Bijal)
March 15, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Request for Judicial Notice (Vakil, Bijal)
March 13, 2017 Filing 44 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #39 Emergency SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration of Order Denying Walmart's Motion to Transfer Venue [Dkt No. 35] filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
March 6, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Lawrence Green, III on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Green, Robert)
March 6, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Stephen Schlichter on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Schlichter, Eric)
March 6, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John R Keville on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Keville, John)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #39 Emergency SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration of Order Denying Walmart's Motion to Transfer Venue [Dkt No. 35] : Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2017 10:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. The Court ORDERS the following expedited briefing schedule for Wal-Mart's Motion: Responses are due on 3-13-2017; Replies are due on 3-20-2017; and Sur-replies are due on 3-27-2017. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/03/17. (mll, )
March 2, 2017 Filing 39 Emergency SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration of Order Denying Walmart's Motion to Transfer Venue [Dkt No. 35] by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bijal V. Vakil, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal)
January 23, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Hess on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Hess, Kevin)
January 23, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig N Tolliver on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Tolliver, Craig)
January 23, 2017 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #16 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 09/29/16. (mll, )
June 17, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated re #16 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO TRANSFER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burgess, Kevin)
June 3, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated re #16 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO TRANSFER (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cheong S. Ang, #2 Declaration of David C. Martin)(Burgess, Kevin)
May 12, 2016 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 5/12/2016 re #16 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
April 15, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #16 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); docket no. 21 - Sealed Motion to Transfer in cause no. 6:15cv1039; and docket no. 48 - Sealed Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer To The Northern District of California in cause no. 6:15cv1038. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2016 10:30 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.(bas) Modified on 4/15/2016 (bas).
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Seal Sur Reply. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/28/2016. (gsg)
March 24, 2016 Filing 30 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #16 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Swords, #2 Exhibit 31, #3 Exhibit 32, #4 Exhibit 33, #5 Exhibit 34, #6 Exhibit 35)(Burgess, Kevin)
March 24, 2016 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Seal SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO WAL-MART'S MOTION TO TRANSFER by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/16/16. (mll, )
March 15, 2016 Filing 27 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Allen Wang, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Affidavit of Nicholas Brailas, #5 Affidavit of Geoff Edwards, #6 Affidavit of Yan Zheng)(Vakil, Bijal)
March 15, 2016 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Reply In Support of Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); Replies due by 3/15/2016. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/03/16. (mll, )
March 2, 2016 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/29/16. (mll, )
February 26, 2016 Filing 22 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #16 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Swords, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Mark C. Swords, #3 Declaration of Cheong Ang, #4 Declaration of Michael D. Doyle, #5 Declaration David C. Martin, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23, #29 Exhibit 24, #30 Exhibit 25, #31 Exhibit 26, #32 Exhibit 27, #33 Exhibit 28, #34 Exhibit 29, #35 Exhibit 30, #36 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
February 26, 2016 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Seal EOLAS'S RESPONSE TO WAL-MART'S MOTION TO TRANSFER by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Kevin)
February 16, 2016 Filing 20 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burgess, Kevin) Modified on 2/16/2016 (sm, ).
February 16, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR, TO BE FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE. Document # 20, Amended Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
February 12, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen W Wang on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Wang, Allen)
February 12, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Conor Flynn on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Flynn, Thomas)
February 12, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shamita D Etienne-Cummings on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Etienne-Cummings, Shamita)
February 9, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bijal V. Vakil, #2 Exhibit A to Vakil Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Vakil Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Vakil Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Vakil Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Vakil Decl., #7 Exhibit F to Vakil Decl., #8 Exhibit G to Vakil Decl., #9 Exhibit H to Vakil Decl., #10 Exhibit I to Vakil Decl., #11 Exhibit J to Vakil Decl., #12 Exhibit K to Vakil Decl., #13 Exhibit L to Vakil Decl., #14 Exhibit M to Vakil Decl., #15 Exhibit N to Vakil Decl., #16 Exhibit O to Vakil Decl., #17 Exhibit P to Vakil Decl., #18 Exhibit Q to Vakil Decl., #19 Exhibit R to Vakil Decl., #20 Exhibit S to Vakil Decl., #21 Declaration of Yan Zheng, #22 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:15-cv-1038 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/05/16. (mll, )
February 8, 2016 This civil action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:15cv1038 designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings -- except relating to venue -- are to be filed in the Lead Case. This case remains active for venue determination and trial. (mll, )
January 25, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF READINESS FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Burgess, Kevin)
January 22, 2016 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Vakil, Bijal)
January 22, 2016 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Vakil, Bijal)
January 21, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Heartfield, J)
January 19, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James E Quigley on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Quigley, James)
December 23, 2015 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..( Vakil, Bijal)
December 23, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC to 1/22/2016; Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. to 1/22/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
December 8, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Bruce Campbell, Jr on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Campbell, John)
December 8, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mario A Apreotesi on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Apreotesi, Mario)
December 4, 2015 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by personal service as to Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC on 12/2/2015, answer due: 12/23/2015; Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. on 12/2/2015; answer due: 12/23/2015. (mll, )
December 1, 2015 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
November 24, 2015 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent None for Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin)
November 24, 2015 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Burgess, Kevin)
November 24, 2015 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Burgess, Kevin)
November 24, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0540-5497502), filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Burgess, Kevin)
November 24, 2015 Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III added. (mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eolas Technologies Incorporated v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC
Represented By: Bijal Vijay Vakil
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Green, III
Represented By: Eric Stephen Schlichter
Represented By: J. Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Allen W. Wang
Represented By: Bijal V Vakil
Represented By: Shamita D. Etienne-Cummings
Represented By: Thomas Conor Flynn
Represented By: John R. Keville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Bijal Vijay Vakil
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Green, III
Represented By: Eric Stephen Schlichter
Represented By: J. Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Allen W. Wang
Represented By: Shamita Etienne-Cummings
Represented By: Thomas Conor Flynn
Represented By: John R. Keville
Represented By: Eric Edmund Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eolas Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: James Elroy Quigley
Represented By: Kevin Hess
Represented By: Kevin Lee Burgess
Represented By: John Bruce Campbell, Jr.
Represented By: Craig N. Tolliver
Represented By: Stephanie M. Adams Ryan
Represented By: Mario Aurel Apreotesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?