Thomas F. White 1991 Trust v. Connell et al

Petitioner: Thomas F. White 1991 Trust
Respondent: David William Connell, CBPV, LLC and ATS, LLC
Case Number: 4:2017cv03177
Filed: June 2, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge Judge William Alsup granting 45 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 19, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE FEE OBJECTIONS re 42 Declaration in Opposition, filed by David William Connell, CBPV, LLC, ATS, LLC Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/19/2017. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
August 17, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS re 34 Order on Motion to Remand, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/17/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
July 18, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/18/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas F. White 1991 Trust v. Connell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas F. White 1991 Trust
Represented By: Kathleen Victoria Fisher
Represented By: Alexander Matthew Freeman
Represented By: Rodney James Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David William Connell
Represented By: William Allan Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CBPV, LLC
Represented By: William Allan Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATS, LLC
Represented By: William Allan Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?