Albert D. Seeno Construction Company et al v. Aspen Insurance UK Limited
Plaintiff: Albert D. Seeno Construction Company, Albert D. Seeno Construction Co., Inc., Discovery Builders, Inc., West Coast Home Builders, Inc., Black Diamond Land Investors, LLC, Seecon Financial and Construction Co., Inc., North Village Development, Inc. and Sanctuary North Village, LLC
Defendant: Aspen Insurance UK Limited
Case Number: 4:2017cv03765
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER VACATING ALL CURRENT DEADLINES AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO STRIKE granting 172 Motion to Strike ; granting 175 Motion to Strike. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER RE: CFOSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 134 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER OF REFERRAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY 108 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY 98 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER OF REFERRAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY granting in part and denying in part 75 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 77 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 78 Discovery Letter Brief. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY granting in part and denying in part 65 Discovery Letter Brief. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE: DISSCOVERY granting in part and denying in part 60 Discovery Letter Brief. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Appointing Mark Newton as Accounting Expert Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence Rule 706). Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/22/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RE: SCOPE OF ACCOUNTING EXPERT'S WORK (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE 6 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albert D. Seeno Construction Company et al v. Aspen Insurance UK Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Insurance UK Limited
Represented By: Maria Louise Cousineau
Represented By: James P. Koelzer
Represented By: Aaron Jeremy Susman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert D. Seeno Construction Company
Represented By: Robert Lee Sallander, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Glenn Seeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert D. Seeno Construction Co., Inc.
Represented By: Robert Lee Sallander, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Glenn Seeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discovery Builders, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Lee Sallander, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Glenn Seeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Coast Home Builders, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Lee Sallander, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Glenn Seeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Diamond Land Investors, LLC
Represented By: Robert Lee Sallander, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Glenn Seeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seecon Financial and Construction Co., Inc.
Represented By: Robert Lee Sallander, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Glenn Seeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Village Development, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Lee Sallander, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Glenn Seeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanctuary North Village, LLC
Represented By: Robert Lee Sallander, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Glenn Seeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?