Ouiby Inc. v. Idil Doguoglu-Posey, et al.,

Plaintiff: Ouiby Inc
Defendant: Idil Doguoglu Posey, Carl Posey Photography, Inc and Carl Posey
Case Number: 4:2017cv03847
Filed: July 6, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2018 82 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING filed by Ouiby Inc. Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2018. Further Case Management Conference reset for 8/16/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/21/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
May 11, 2018 80 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 79 to Extend Case Management Conference Hearing filed by Ouiby Inc. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2018. Further Case Management Conference reset for 6/28/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/11/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
April 10, 2018 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 73 MOTION for Settlement /to Enforce Settlement filed by Ouiby Inc. Motion Hearing reset for 5/17/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2018. Further Case Management Conference reset for 5/17/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/10/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
February 6, 2018 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 62 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims with Leave to Amend. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ouiby Inc. v. Idil Doguoglu-Posey, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ouiby Inc
Represented By: Robin E Alexander
Represented By: Rene I. Gamboa
Represented By: Jeffrey Harold Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idil Doguoglu Posey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Posey Photography, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Posey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?