GCCFC 2005-GG5 Hegenberger Retail Limited Partnership v. Arce et al

Plaintiff: GCCFC 2005-GG5 Hegenberger Retail Limited Partnership
Defendant: George A. Arce, Jr., Raquel M. Remedios and Leslie M. Tuttle
Case Number: 4:2017cv03854
Filed: July 7, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2018 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND EQUITABLE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 45 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
January 23, 2018 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JOINDER; DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS 21 22 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
July 27, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PLAINTIFF RE: DIVERSITY JURISDICTION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/27/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GCCFC 2005-GG5 Hegenberger Retail Limited Partnership v. Arce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GCCFC 2005-GG5 Hegenberger Retail Limited Partnership
Represented By: Paul Evans Chronis
Represented By: Meagen Eileen Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A. Arce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raquel M. Remedios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie M. Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?