Moralez v. David & Esperanza Chavez Family Limited Partnership et al

Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Defendant: David & Esperanza Chavez Family Limited Partnership, Chavez Supermarket Holding Corp., John E. McNellis, Michele R. McNellis and Michael S Powers
Case Number: 4:2017cv03918
Filed: July 11, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Complete Joint Site Inspection Required by General Order 56; [Proposed] Order filed by Michele S. Powers, Michael S Powers, Michele R. McNellis, David & Esperanza Chavez Family Limited Partnership, John E. McNellis, Chavez Supermarket Holding Corp. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 12, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
November 27, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER extending deadline to complete joint site inspection (second) filed by Francisca Moralez. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
October 25, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Extending Deadline to Complete Joint Site Inspection Required by General Order 56 re 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case filed by Francisca Moralez. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 25, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moralez v. David & Esperanza Chavez Family Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Represented By: Zachary Manning Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David & Esperanza Chavez Family Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chavez Supermarket Holding Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. McNellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele R. McNellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?