Piasecki v. Sanofi Pasteur Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mercia Piasecki
Defendant: Sanofi Pasteur Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 4:2017cv04101
Filed: July 20, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO ENGAGE IN PRIVATE MEDIATION by Judge William Alsup granting 27 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
November 9, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Judge William Alsup granting 24 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Spencer James Davidson terminated.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
September 22, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER by Hon. William Alsup denying 10 Motion to Transfer Case.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piasecki v. Sanofi Pasteur Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi Pasteur Inc.
Represented By: Timothy M. Hoppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Timothy M. Hoppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercia Piasecki
Represented By: Michelle G. Lee
Represented By: Meghan F. Loisel
Represented By: David A. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?